MD HB1654 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying the circumstances under which a broadband Internet access service provider may handle certain customer personal information in a certain manner; establishing a mechanism through which a broadband Internet access service provider may obtain customer consent to have certain personal information handled in a certain manner; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that if the State or a municipality provides broadband Internet services, they may not impose use restrictions that prohibit the exercise of free speech; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (86-46) (Y: 87 N: 47 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {553524/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (50-83) (Y: 51 N: 84 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {713724/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (47-83) (Y: 48 N: 84 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {753426/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (50-81) (Y: 51 N: 82 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-23 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order Until 4/2 (Delegate Frick) Adopted (88-46) (Y: 89 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (86-46)
2018-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-03HouseFloor Amendment {673429/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted
2018-04-03HouseFloor Amendment {753426/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (50-81)
2018-04-03HouseFloor Amendment {553524/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (50-83)
2018-04-03HouseFloor Amendment {713724/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (47-83)
2018-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2018-03-30HouseSpecial Order until 4/2 (Delegate Frick) Adopted (88-46)
2018-03-30HouseCommittee Amendment Adopted
2018-03-30HouseFavorable with Amendments {663397/1
2018-03-30HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-07HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1654&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1654f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1654t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1654_66339701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1654_55352401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1654_67342901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1654_71372401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1654_75342601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb1654.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1654_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0961.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0999.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1059.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback