MD HB1652 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to include psychiatrists who are providing Assertive Community Treatment or mobile treatment services to certain Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipients in the types of providers eligible to receive reimbursement for health care services that are delivered through telemedicine and provided to Program recipients; and requiring the Department to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by September 30, 2020, on the effect of certain reimbursements.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Assertive Community Treatment and Mobile Treatment Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {876788/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Patients
Psychiatrists
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Patients
Psychiatrists
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology