MD HB1651 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the criteria on which a sustainable community designation may be based to include whether the sustainable community plan addresses certain housing issues.
Title
Sustainable Communities – Designation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-7) (Y: 128 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-7) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {780818/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Community Development
Economic and Community Development
Housing
Local Government - Generally
Smart Growth
Zoning and Planning
Economic and Community Development
Housing
Local Government - Generally
Smart Growth
Zoning and Planning