MD HB1646 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 76-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a State's Attorney to serve a written notice on a certain defendant, defendant's counsel, and the court prior to trial or the acceptance of a guilty plea or the equivalent; requiring a court to inform, verbally or in writing, a defendant convicted of a certain offense that the defendant is prohibited from possessing certain firearms and is ordered to transfer certain firearms in accordance with the Act; authorizing the court to issue a search warrant based on probable cause that certain weapons have not been surrendered; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer

Sponsors

Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Bilal Ali [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Angela Angel [D]
Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]
Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]
Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Dereck Davis [D]
Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]
Del. William Frick [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]Del. Angela Gibson [D]
Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Antonio Hayes [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]
Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Jay Jalisi [D]
Del. Sally Jameson [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]
Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]
Del. Clarence Lam [D]Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]
Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Cory McCray [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Aruna Miller [D]
Del. David Moon [D]Del. Marice Morales [D]Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]
Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Andrew Platt [D]
Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Shane Robinson [D]
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]
Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Mary Washington [D]
Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Pat Young [D]
Del. Bob Flanagan [R]

Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-4) (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-5) (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {403126/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (46-89) (Y: 47 N: 90 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {573523/1 (Delegate Vogt) Rejected (44-87) (Y: 45 N: 88 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-09SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (135-4)
2018-04-09HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2018-04-06SenateSenators Zirkin, Ready, and Muse
2018-04-06SenateConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-06SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2018-04-05HouseDelegates Moon, Queen, and Malone
2018-04-05HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-05HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2018-04-05HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {208176/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (129-5)
2018-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {363822/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted
2018-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {403126/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (46-89)
2018-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {573523/1 (Delegate Vogt) Rejected (44-87)
2018-03-13HouseSpecial Order until next session (Delegate Saab) Adopted
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {622411/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-03-06HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1646&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1646f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1646t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1646e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1646_62241101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1646_36382201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1646_40312601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1646_57352301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1646_20817601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1646_85382901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb1646.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1646_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0392.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0393.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0459.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1646_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1086.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1646_85382901.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1409.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1318.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback