MD HB164 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified appointing authorities in the State Personnel Management System to require specified prospective or current employees to provide specified information, for at least the previous 5-year period, for a specified background investigation; authorizing specified appointing authorities to request from the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository a State and national criminal history records check for specified prospective and current employees; etc.
Title
State Personnel Management System - Background Investigation and Criminal History Records Check - Prospective and Current Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98 |
2016-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-03 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {574063/1 Adopted |
2016-03-03 | House | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted |
2016-03-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {924264/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2016-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-21 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appeals
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Ethics
Fees
Fingerprinting
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Ethics
Fees
Fingerprinting
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment