MD HB1639 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Department of Budget and Management from contracting with a pharmacy benefits manager under certain circumstances.
Title
Maryland Rx Program - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Contracts With Pharmacies and Pharmacists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2018-03-05 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Budget and Management, Department of
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Corporations
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
State Government - Personnel
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Corporations
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
State Government - Personnel