MD HB1637 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the time for the submission of the interim report to September 1, 2021, and for the final report to December 1, 2022, of the Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission and extending the termination date for the Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Lynching Truth and Reconciliation Commission - Reporting and Sunset Extension

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseHearing canceled
2020-03-03HouseHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-02HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2020-02-24HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2019(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback