MD HB1635 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a certain person to attach a copy of an order of the court establishing parentage to a certificate of birth under certain circumstances; requiring, for a birth involving a gestational carrier in which parentage is determined by a certain court, that certain information be entered on the certificate of birth and that the order of the court establishing parentage be attached to the certificate; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Department of Health - Birth Registration - Gestational Carriers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseHearing canceled (Judiciary) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
2020-03-14HouseHearing canceled (Judiciary) and Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2020-03-14HouseHearing canceled (Judiciary)
2020-03-03HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
2020-03-03HouseRereferred to Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
2020-02-24HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Same As/Similar To

SB1062 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Referred Judiciary Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General4208(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General4226(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback