MD HB1635 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a certain hearing officer from ordering the release of an individual who meets the requirements for involuntary admission under a certain provision of law on the grounds that the individual was kept at an emergency facility for more than 30 hours.
Title
Mental Health Law - Involuntary Admissions - Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 729 |
2018-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {686486/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Public Employees
Public Health
State Hospitals
Emergency Medical Services
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Public Employees
Public Health
State Hospitals