MD HB1634 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that the State Superintendent of Schools be appointed with the advice and consent of the Senate; and prohibiting the appointment of an individual as State Superintendent if the individual is, or during the immediately preceding year was, a member of the State Board of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Superintendent of Schools - Qualifications and Senate Confirmation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (95-37)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {195462/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-03-10HouseHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-02HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2020-02-24HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education2301(n/a)See Bill Text
Education2302(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback