MD HB1634 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "unfair or deceptive trade practice" to be "unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice"; providing the purpose of the Act is to support enforcement by and funding of the Office of the Attorney General and the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to protect State residents when conducting financial transactions and receiving certain services; requiring the Commissioner to designate an individual as the Student Loan Ombudsman; requiring the establishment of a student loan borrower education course; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order Until 4/9 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (14-29) (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-12) (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-42) (Y: 94 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-46) (Y: 88 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 731
2018-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (93-42)
2018-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (32-12)
2018-04-06SenateFloor Amendment {877771/1 Finance Adopted
2018-04-06SenateMotion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Waugh) Rejected (14-29)
2018-04-06SenateFloor Amendment {877771/1 Finance
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {417178/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (87-46)
2018-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {233198/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-02-16HouseHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects

Accountants
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Appropriations
Attorney General
Budgets
Civil Actions
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Corporations
Court of Appeals
Criminal Background Investigations
Debt Collection
Disclosure
Discrimination
Education
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Exemptions
Fees
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Fines
Fingerprinting
Fraud
Governor
Higher Education
Investigations and Inquiries
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Liability
Licenses
Loans
Mortgages
Notaries Public
Ombudsmen
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
Prices
Public Officials
Reports
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Securities
Students
Time
Unfair Trade Practices
Work, Labor and Employment

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1634&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1634f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1634t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1634e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_731_hb1634e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1634_23319801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1634_41717801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1634_87777101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb1634.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1634_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0538.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1634_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1250.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1251.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1334.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback