MD HB1633 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Baltimore County Board of Education to elect a chair and vice chair by a quorum of a majority of the voting members then serving rather than by a majority vote of the members present and voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore County Board of Education - Election of Officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-24HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2020-02-21HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Same As/Similar To

SB1055 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education32B-09(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback