MD HB1631 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain retirement income attributable to certain out-of-state employment as a correctional officer, law enforcement officer, or fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseUnfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
2020-02-21HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Same As/Similar To

SB1030 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-14 - First Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General10209(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback