MD HB163 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Public Service Commission to establish a Combined Heat and Power System Program; allowing all rate classes to participate in the program; requiring an electric company to use a certain tariff structure to provide credits to owner-operators under the program; requiring a combined heat and power system to satisfy certain requirements and meet certain criteria; authorizing the export of excess generation from a system in a certain manner; requiring the Commission to adopt certain regulations by October 1, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electricity - Combined Heat and Power Systems - Metering

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback