MD HB1629 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Office of the Attorney General to study and identify certain information relating to certain firearm crimes, injuries, fatalities, and crime firearms; requiring all State and local law enforcement agencies and other governmental units to provide the Office of the Attorney General with all information necessary to complete the study; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2020, December 1, 2021, and December 1, 2022; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of the Attorney General – Firearm Crime, Injuries, Fatalities, and Crime Firearms – Study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (Y: 130 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
2020-03-18HousePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (100-28)
2020-03-18HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (30-15)
2020-03-18SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
2020-03-18SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Rejected
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-18SenateCommittee Amendment {828075/1 Adopted
2020-03-17SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {828075/1
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-13SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (106-28)
2020-03-11HouseSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-11HouseFavorable Adopted
2020-03-11HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-02-24HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-20HouseReferred Judiciary
2020-02-20HouseMotion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (130-8)
2020-02-20HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Same As/Similar To

SB1047 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback