MD HB1626 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a custodian of records for the Motor Vehicle Administration to disclose certain personal information to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement only after being provided with a valid warrant or subpoena issued by a federal court or a court of this State;

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Information Act - Motor Vehicle Administration - Warrant or Subpoena for Personal Information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-07HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2018-03-29HouseHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-26HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-27HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-22HouseHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-12HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-13HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-07HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-08HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback