MD HB1618 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Cigarette Restitution Fund to include a separate account to be used for substance use treatment, with priority given to residential treatment services, recovery support housing, and specified crisis response services, and for rate adjustments for specified agencies or programs; requiring specified distributions from the account to be used to supplement and not supplant specified other funds; prohibiting more than $10,000,000 from being appropriated from the account in any fiscal year; etc.
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Guzzone) Adopted (33-13) (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Guzzone) Adopted (33-13) (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted (33-13) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {709530/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Finance |
2016-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2016-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2016-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {486381/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-11 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-02 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Budgets
Cigarettes
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Emergency Medical Services
Governor
Health
Housing
Mental Health
Public Health
Reports
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Substance Abuse
Appropriations
Budgets
Cigarettes
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Emergency Medical Services
Governor
Health
Housing
Mental Health
Public Health
Reports
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Substance Abuse