MD HB1617 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "eligible veteran" to include the Commissioned Corps of the Public Health Service and the Commissioned Corps of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for the purpose of granting a preference in hiring and promotion to eligible veterans, spouses of eligible veterans, and surviving spouses of eligible veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans of Commissioned Corps

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-14) (Y: 121 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 587
2018-03-30HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (120-14)
2018-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-13HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback