MD HB1615 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Temporary Disability Assistance Program in the Department of Human Services; requiring the Family Investment Administration to be the central coordinating and directing agency of the Program; requiring the Program to be administered by the local departments of social services in a certain manner; specifying the requirements for entitlement to assistance under the Program; requiring the monthly allowable assistance under the Program to equal at least $215 in fiscal year 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 408
2018-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {187872/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {884060/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-02-27HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1615&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1615f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1615t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1615e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_408_hb1615e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/hb1615_88406001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0005/hb1615_18787201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb1615.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1615_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0495.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1615_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1056.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1104.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback