MD HB1615 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Linking Youth to New Experiences (LYNX) High School at Frederick High School in Frederick County; providing that the LYNX High School is a public school under the authority of the County Board of Education and the County Superintendent of Schools; providing that the purpose of the LYNX High School is to provide individualized, self-directed learning opportunities for every student in accordance with a personal plan for success; requiring the County Superintendent to develop a specified plan on or before September 30, 2016; etc.
Title
Frederick County - Linking Youth to New Experiences (LYNX) High School
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {605668/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2016-02-29 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Apprentices
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Frederick County
Gifts
Grants
Job Training
Labor and Industry, Division of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Teachers
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Frederick County
Gifts
Grants
Job Training
Labor and Industry, Division of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Teachers