MD HB1614 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain rights granted to members of the Maryland National Guard under the Act are in addition to the rights granted by federal law; establishing that the intent of the Act is to supplement certain rights and protections provided by a certain federal statute; authorizing a certain service member to terminate a certain contract at a certain time under certain circumstances; providing for the method by which a certain service member may terminate a certain contract; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Military Service Members - Civil Relief
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344 |
2018-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Commercial Law - Generally
Contracts
Liability
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Safety
Radio
Sports and Recreation
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Utilities
Work, Labor and Employment
Commercial Law - Generally
Contracts
Liability
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Safety
Radio
Sports and Recreation
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Utilities
Work, Labor and Employment