MD HB1611 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for the total installed costs of specified HVAC energy efficiency technology installed on or after January 1, 2016; providing that the credit may not exceed a specified amount; providing that the credit may not be carried forward to another taxable year; requiring a taxpayer claiming the credit to attach proof of the total installed costs to the taxpayer's return; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Title
Income Tax Credit - HVAC Energy Efficiency Technology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-18 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2016-02-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |