MD HB1610 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to convene a workgroup to study the advisability of the State, along with hospitals, pharmacies, health care facilities and private medical practices, forming a generic drugs and medical supplies purchasing cooperative; requiring that the workgroup include specified individuals; requiring the workgroup to make recommendations regarding specified matters and report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2018; etc.
Title
Public Health - Generic Drugs and Medical Supplies Purchasing Cooperative Workgroup
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2017-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-08 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-23 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Drugs
Equipment
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Public Health
Reports
Sunset
Drugs
Equipment
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Public Health
Reports
Sunset