MD HB1609 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying that certain provisions of law concerning the method of calculating a certain reduction in the State agricultural land transfer tax apply to a transfer under a contract of sale dated on or after July 1, 2019; clarifying that a certain exemption from the State agricultural land transfer tax applies to a transfer under a contract of sale dated on or after July 1, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Application of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-12HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2020-03-03HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-03HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2020-02-17HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2019(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property13303(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property13305(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback