MD HB1607 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program to pilot a management model where a juvenile services education program at a facility located in a county is operated by the county board of education; requiring the Program to begin in the 2019-2020 school year; requiring the State Department of Education to identify one juvenile services education program to participate in the Program; requiring a certain workgroup to make recommendations on the management and operation of juvenile services education programs; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 565
2018-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {514039/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {855962/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1607&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1607f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1607t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1607e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_565_hb1607e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1607_85596201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1607_51403901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb1607.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1607_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1607_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0656.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1607_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1236.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1365.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback