MD HB1604 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring innkeepers and hosting platform operators that offer certain types of limited residential lodging to operate in a certain manner; requiring that certain records be made available to certain entities; authorizing certain entities to order an innkeeper to cease and desist from offering limited residential lodging; providing that a hosting platform operator may not, except under certain circumstances, participate in or facilitate certain booking transactions; authorizing certain local jurisdictions to adopt certain laws; etc.
Title
Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Civil Actions
Comptroller
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Fire Protection
Hotels and Motels
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Law Enforcement
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Rules and Regulations
Civil Actions
Comptroller
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Fire Protection
Hotels and Motels
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Law Enforcement
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Rules and Regulations