MD HB1603 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board to study and make recommendations on policy and practice changes and capital expenditures necessary to achieve standardization of data collection on race and ethnicity in the State; requiring the Board to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 30, 2019; terminating the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board - Data Collection on Race and Ethnicity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {956186/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-07HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback