MD HB16 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a person to file a petition for a partial expungement of certain criminal records under certain circumstances; requiring a court to order that certain records be removed from a certain website; providing that only a certain record is eligible for partial expungement; and repealing a provision of law establishing that if a person is not entitled to expungement of one charge or conviction in a certain unit the person is not entitled to expungement of any other charge or conviction in the unit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseUnfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
2019-01-22HouseHearing canceled
2019-01-10HouseHearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2018-11-20HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback