MD HB16 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor to include $125,000 in the State budget, in fiscal years 2020 through 2024, for the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish a near completer communication campaign; requiring the Commission to develop a web-based match program for near completers to facilitate the matching of a near completer with a certain institution; establishing a Maryland Community College Promise Scholarship program to provide tuition assistance for students to attend a community college in the State; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Colleges - Near Completers and Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-47) (Y: 92 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-40) (Y: 93 N: 41 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 554
2018-04-09HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (90-48)
2018-04-09HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (32-14)
2018-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {984432/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-04-09SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
2018-04-06SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (92-40)
2018-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05HouseFloor Amendment {383920/1 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
2018-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {985264/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-01-25HouseHearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-10HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2017-10-02HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0016&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0016f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0016t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0016e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_554_hb0016e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0016_38392001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0016_98526401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0016_98443201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb0016.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0016_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1146.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0016_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1522.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1444.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback