MD HB1596 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 69-4)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 738
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that, except as prohibited by federal law, a provision in certain employment contracts, policies, or agreements that waive certain rights or remedies to a claim of sexual harassment or certain retaliation is null and void as being against the public policy of the State; requiring employers with 50 or more employees to submit a certain survey to the Commission on Civil Rights; requiring the Commission to make the survey responses accessible to the public by posting certain information on the Commission's website; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018

Sponsors

Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Angela Angel [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]
Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]
Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Pamela Beidle [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]
Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]
Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. Bob Flanagan [R]
Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. William Frick [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]
Del. Angela Gibson [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Glen Glass [R]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]
Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]
Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]
Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]
Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]
Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Herbert McMillan [R]Del. Aruna Miller [D]
Del. David Moon [D]Del. Marice Morales [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]
Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Meagan Simonaire [R]
Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]
Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Mary Washington [D]
Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Sally Jameson [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]
Del. C.T. Wilson [D]

Roll Calls

2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 738
2018-04-09HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-09SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2018-04-09HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateSenators Klausmeier, Benson, and Reilly
2018-04-09SenateConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-09SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2018-04-06HouseDelegates Valderrama, Aumann, and Clippinger
2018-04-06HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-06HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2018-04-06HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {367375/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {353190/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-02-27HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1596&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1596f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1596t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1596e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_738_hb1596e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1596_35319001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1596_36737501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1596_81352901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1596_69352601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb1596.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1596_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0438.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1596_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1055.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1596_69352601.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1460.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1379.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback