MD HB159 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the secretary of a principal department in the Executive Branch, the president of a public senior higher education institution, and a unit of State government to provide certain information to the State Ethics Commission in a timely manner for the Ethics Commission to make a certain determination whether an individual in an executive unit is a public official for certain purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Ethics Commission – Determination of Public Official in an Executive Unit – Information From Units of State Government

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2020-02-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-02-17HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-17HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-17HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-17HouseHearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-15HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions5208(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback