MD HB1589 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring every employer in the State to allow any employee, rather than any employee who claims to be a registered voter, in the State a certain period of absence from work to vote in an election, rather than only on election day; requiring the employee to provide reasonable proof to the employer in a timely manner that the employee voted or attempted to vote; prohibiting an employer from taking certain actions against an employee who exercises the right under certain provisions of law to be absent from work to vote; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Time Off for Employee Voting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (94-35)
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-25HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-24HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2020-02-13HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law10315(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback