MD HB1585 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Extending and altering the Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill certain appropriations to the Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund for certain fiscal years; altering certain requirements for certain individuals in certain positions funded by endowment proceeds; altering the distribution of certain revenue from the State admissions and amusement tax in a certain manner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Extension and Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (131-1)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {375160/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-25HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-24HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2020-02-13HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Same As/Similar To

SB389 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Economic Development6604(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development6612(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development6614(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development6618(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General2202(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback