MD HB1579 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Law Enforcement Coordinating Council to prevent and reduce crime by coordinating and focusing State resources and ensuring interagency communication and intelligence-sharing; requiring the Council to prepare a certain comprehensive crime plan for the State; requiring the Council to meet quarterly; requiring the Governor to attend at least one Council meeting each year; and requiring the Council to submit a report with its recommendations by December 1 each year to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Crime Plan and Law Enforcement Councils (Maryland State Crime Plan)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-24HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2020-02-12HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Same As/Similar To

SB907 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety2315(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety2316(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback