MD HB1575 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a criminal justice unit from presenting victims of sexually assaultive behavior with forms or verbal agreements purporting to limit the obligations of the criminal justice unit to the victim or limit the rights of the victim; prohibiting certain evidence from being introduced in certain court proceedings; authorizing victims affected by a violation of the Act to bring a certain action; requiring by January 1, 2021, each criminal justice unit to adopt a certain policy; applying the Act retroactively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Waivers of Rights - Prohibition

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseHearing canceled
2020-03-03HouseHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-03HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2020-02-12HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Same As/Similar To

SB807 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Procedure11929(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback