MD HB1573 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that an owner of a certain solar electric generating facility provide certain notice of the sale or transfer of the facility to certain entities no later than 30 days after selling or otherwise transferring ownership; and requiring the notice of the sale or transfer to include the name, address, phone number, and e-mail address of the new owner.
Title
Solar Electric Generating Facility – Notice of Sale or Transfer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245 |
2018-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {337173/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {993794/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |