MD HB1571 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-8)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that the assessment of a certain fee by the State Health Services Cost Review Commission for funding the Hospital Employees Retraining Fund is to be in the case of a hospital closure, merger, or full delicensure; altering the circumstances under which hospitals are required to pay a certain fee directly to the Maryland Department of Labor; requiring certain hospitals to pay an annual direct remittance to the Department by July 1; requiring certain money from the Fund be returned to certain hospitals under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490
2020-03-18HousePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-18HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {447371/1 Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-03-16SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {696283/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-03-03HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-24HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Same As/Similar To

SB938 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General19223(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General19326.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment11201(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback