MD HB1571 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-8)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-8)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the assessment of a certain fee by the State Health Services Cost Review Commission for funding the Hospital Employees Retraining Fund is to be in the case of a hospital closure, merger, or full delicensure; altering the circumstances under which hospitals are required to pay a certain fee directly to the Maryland Department of Labor; requiring certain hospitals to pay an annual direct remittance to the Department by July 1; requiring certain money from the Fund be returned to certain hospitals under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 490 |
2020-03-18 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {447371/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {696283/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-24 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-10 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB938 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Communications
Fees
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Communications
Fees
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 223 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 326.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |