MD HB1571 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a county board of education, a nonpublic school receiving State funds, and a certain contracting agency to require an applicant for a position involving direct contact with minors to provide certain information; requiring the county board, nonpublic school, or contracting agency to conduct a review of the employment history of a certain applicant; requiring the State Department of Education to provide a certain notification; requiring substitute staffing services to comply with certain provisions; etc.
Title
Education - Child Sexual Abuse Prevention - Employment Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {855269/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Child Abuse and Neglect
Collective Bargaining
Contracts
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Fraud
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Minors
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Safety
Public Schools
School Administration
Sexual Offenses
State Employees
Work, Labor and Employment
Child Abuse and Neglect
Collective Bargaining
Contracts
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Fraud
Investigations and Inquiries
Licenses
Minors
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Safety
Public Schools
School Administration
Sexual Offenses
State Employees
Work, Labor and Employment