MD HB1571 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a county board of education, a nonpublic school receiving State funds, and a certain contracting agency to require an applicant for a position involving direct contact with minors to provide certain information; requiring the county board, nonpublic school, or contracting agency to conduct a review of the employment history of a certain applicant; requiring the State Department of Education to provide a certain notification; requiring substitute staffing services to comply with certain provisions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Child Sexual Abuse Prevention - Employment Process

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {855269/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback