MD HB1567 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Affordable Housing Development Credit Program within the Division of Development Finance of the Department of Housing and Community Development to provide certain owners of certain low-income housing projects certain tax credits for a certain number of years; authorizing an owner or a developer of a low-income housing project to submit a certain application to the Department to enroll in the Program on or after July 1, 2020, but before July 1, 2023; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB715 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-17 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Housing and Community Development42701(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development42702(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development42703(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development42704(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development42705(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development42706(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development42707(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development42708(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance6105.3(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance6303.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General10749(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General10751(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General8222(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General8418(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback