MD HB1560 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission from discriminating against a person on the basis of genetic information or family responsibilities; and requiring that a certain nondiscrimination provision in contracts entered into by the Commission prohibit certain discrimination based on genetic information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited PG/MC 103-20

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-14SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {696385/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance27909(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities16101(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities17402(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities17402.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback