MD HB1558 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing, with a certain exception, a pharmacist to dispense, in a single dispensing and exercising the pharmacist's professional judgment, a quantity of a prescription drug that is up to a certain number of authorized dosage units and does not exceed a 90-day supply of the prescription drug; providing that the Act does not apply to a certain controlled dangerous substance or certain prescriptions that an authorized prescriber prescribes for a patient; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacists - Dispensing of Prescription Drugs - Single Dispensing of Dosage Units

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-29SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-23SenateReassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-23SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {896185/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-07HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback