MD HB1558 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, with a certain exception, a pharmacist to dispense, in a single dispensing and exercising the pharmacist's professional judgment, a quantity of a prescription drug that is up to a certain number of authorized dosage units and does not exceed a 90-day supply of the prescription drug; providing that the Act does not apply to a certain controlled dangerous substance or certain prescriptions that an authorized prescriber prescribes for a patient; etc.
Title
Pharmacists - Dispensing of Prescription Drugs - Single Dispensing of Dosage Units
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461 |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {896185/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Birth Control
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Health Occupations
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Time
Weights and Measures
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Health Occupations
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Time
Weights and Measures