MD HB1556 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the establishment of a Veterans' Treatment Court Pilot Program in Wicomico County, Frederick County, and Prince George's County under specified circumstances; authorizing the Chief Judge of the Court of Appeals to accept a gift or grant for the Veterans' Treatment Court Pilot Program; and providing that a defendant charged with a nonviolent crime who is a veteran and who exhibits substance abuse or mental health problems is eligible for diversion to a veterans' treatment court.
Title
Courts - Veterans' Treatment Court Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary | |
2010-03-23 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-22 | Re-referred Judiciary | |
2010-03-15 | Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-03-15 | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Hubbard) Adopted (132-0) | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Appeals
Circuit Courts
Court of Appeals
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Frederick County
Gifts
Grants
Judges
Jurisdiction
Mental Health
Parole and Probation
Petitions
Prince George`s County
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State`s Attorneys
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Veterans
Wicomico County
Appeals
Circuit Courts
Court of Appeals
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Frederick County
Gifts
Grants
Judges
Jurisdiction
Mental Health
Parole and Probation
Petitions
Prince George`s County
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
State`s Attorneys
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Veterans
Wicomico County
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB1556.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb1556f.pdf |