MD HB1555 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City, beginning on or after January 1, 2022, to require certain members of the command staff of the Police Department of Baltimore City to reside in Baltimore City; requiring a certain local law, ordinance, or policy enacted or adopted by the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to include a certain waiver, exemption, or 120-day grace period to begin residence in Baltimore City under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department - Residency Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (128-5)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {664264/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB72 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 512

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Baltimore City161(n/a)See Bill Text
Baltimore City162A(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback