MD HB1552 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing an Education Savings Account program in the State; stating the purpose of the program; establishing the requirements for participation in the program; requiring a certain deposit into the account of certain students; establishing a process for calculating and depositing a certain amount; limiting the use of certain funds to certain educational purposes; establishing the autonomy of a participating private school; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education Savings Account Program - Established

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
2020-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-11HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB418 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-12 - Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education9.11101(n/a)See Bill Text
Education9.11102(n/a)See Bill Text
Education9.11103(n/a)See Bill Text
Education9.11104(n/a)See Bill Text
Education9.11105(n/a)See Bill Text
Education9.11106(n/a)See Bill Text
Education9.11107(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback