MD HB1552 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain preferred provider to provide supplies and services directly to the State or a certain entity; prohibiting a certain preferred provider from contracting with a subcontractor to provide certain supplies and services; requiring the Pricing and Selection Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and the Employment Works Program to ensure that not less than a certain percent of certain supplies and services create certain work opportunities; etc.
Title
Procurement - Preferred Providers - Price Determinations, Work Opportunities, and Subcontracting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2018-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Disabilities
Prices
Procurement
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Disabilities
Prices
Procurement
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement