MD HB1551 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Prince George's County Local Management Board to develop and implement a strategic plan to raise revenues to match the total funding provided by the Governor's Office for Children by January 1, 2018; requiring the Local Management Board to submit a specified report by January 1 each year; requiring Prince George's County to study the feasibility of converting the Local Management Board into a quasi-public nonprofit corporation and the leveraging of specified funds by specified quasi-public nonprofit corporations; etc.
Title
Prince George's County Local Management Board - Strategic Plan, Report, and Study PG 426-17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {890210/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-08 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-16 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Children
Committees and Commissions
County Councils
County Executives
Disclosure
Gifts
Grants
Human Relations
Nonprofit Organizations
Prince George's County
Public Officials
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Committees and Commissions
County Councils
County Executives
Disclosure
Gifts
Grants
Human Relations
Nonprofit Organizations
Prince George's County
Public Officials
Reports
Revenue and Taxes