MD HB155 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting carriers that offer life insurance, long-term care insurance, and disability insurance policies or contracts from taking certain action regarding coverage based on whether an applicant or policy or contract holder has requested or undergone genetic testing or the results of the genetic testing; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health to review and update certain materials relating to the benefits of genetic testing and the impact of testing on access to certain insurance policies and contracts by April 1, 2024.
Title
Genetic Testing – Prohibitions on Disability, Life, and Long–Term Care Insurance and Educational Materials (Genetic Testing Protection Act of 2023)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2023-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-16 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB212 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-25 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Education
Genetics
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Public Health
Public Information
Genetics
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Public Health
Public Information
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 27 | 909 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 27 | 909.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |